Company Name | Designation | Appointed on | DSC | Status |
---|---|---|---|---|
AKSHAT INFRACON PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | - | Yes | Active |
DR. M. COMMERCE AND INDUSTRIES LIMITED | Director | - | Yes | Active |
UNI-PART AUTO INDUSTRIES PRIVATE LIMITED | Additional Director | - | Yes | Resigned |
BANSIWALA EXIM PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | 17 Jan, 2023 | Yes | Active |
OMANSH ENTERPRISES LIMITED | Director | - | Yes | Active |
HARDIK INFRACON PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | - | Yes | Active |
PITAMBER INFRACON PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | - | - | Active |
GEETANJALI INFRACON PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | 05 May, 2008 | - | Active |
GEET INFRAPROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | 28 Nov, 2008 | - | Active |
GULMARG OVERSEAS PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | - | - | Active |
ACHYUT PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | 16 Jul, 2013 | - | Active |
GLITZ ADVERTISING PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | - | - | Active |
Follow @corporatedir | ||||